+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H3946
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor