+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4041
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor