+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor