+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/05/17 from 12:00PM-5:00PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor