+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Recommitted to the committee on Election Laws
- Rules suspended
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor