+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
- Read second
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor