+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture