+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 19, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4613
On October 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/13/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On October 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor