+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Rules
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor