+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4403
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws