+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor