+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 4, 2023 in the House:
- Enacted
On January 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 29, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 27, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 19, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government