+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4234
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2013 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Worcester Senior Center
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor