+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied S539
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor