+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On December 29, 2022 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 20, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 22, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor