+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
- Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor