+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2020 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On November 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor