+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2015
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendments
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
- Referred to the committee on temporary Committee on House Rules
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act establishing a sick leave bank
for David Ogar, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of
Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor