+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
On January 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On January 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service