+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2020
On December 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On November 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- New draft of H4588
- Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor