+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 22, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4333
On July 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 24, 2014, pending concurrence
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 27, 2014, pending concurrence
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Education