+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 366 of the Acts of 2018
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third, amended, and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2018 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-2
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service