+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
On January 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On November 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 8, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2018 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in A-1
On October 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service