+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 441 of the Acts of 2018
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On July 3, 2018 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 18, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Accompanied by S545
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 9, 2018, pending concurrence
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor