+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On November 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On November 2, 2020 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On July 30, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2020 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in Virtual Hearing
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor