+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 11, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4456
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
On December 30, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Public Service
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor