+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2022
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 21, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 27, 2022 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 31, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor