+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 7, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5139
On September 3, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday September 10, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Thursday August 20, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday August 20, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor