+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 269 of the Acts of 2018
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government