+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2018
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On August 27, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On August 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws