+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on The Judiciary
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor