+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2015
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the temporary committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor