+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 197 of the Acts of 2018
On July 31, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 31, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On July 16, 2018 in the House:
- Recommitted to the committee on Housing
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing