+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
- New draft of H173
- Reported from the committee on Cannabis Policy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor