+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On November 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 380 of the Acts of 2014
On November 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 17, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 13, 2014 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On October 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On October 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 20, 2014 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor