+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2018
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
- Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws