+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On September 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2016
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On August 22, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On August 22, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On August 18, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
On August 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment
- Rules suspended
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 31, 2016 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On July 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
Emergency Preamble