+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- New draft of S2225
- Reported from the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor