+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On July 31, 2016 in the House:
- Reported by H4565
On July 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on its amendments
- Rules suspended
On July 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of conference appointed (Mariano-Donato-Vieira)
- House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
- Rules suspended
On July 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of conference appointed (L'Italien-Rodrigues-O'Connor), in concurrence
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
On July 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, July 13, 2016
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2410
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- H4397, published as amended
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act modernizing municipal finance and
government
+ − Vote
July 13, 2016: Senate Roll Call # 410
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
NONE
Type:
Primary Sponsor