+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On October 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture