+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 28, 2014 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H4359
- Amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Read second
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment previously recommended pending
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment previously recommended pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with an amendment, substituting a bill with the same title, see H4359
On July 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On July 23, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2014 from 11:30 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
On July 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On July 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor