+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Report rejected
- Rules suspended
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor