+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor