+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5051
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday March 5, 2020, pending concurrence
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437
On December 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Cannabis Policy
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor