+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On August 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018
On July 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Governor
- Enacted - roll call #472 [37 YEAS - 0 NAYS]
On July 25, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 413)
On July 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On July 23, 2018 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On July 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 9, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2018 from 02:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/13/2018 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules