+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 15, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5037
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On December 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on The Judiciary
On November 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor