+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2614
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Health
On October 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor