+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 13, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5348
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 13, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On October 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
On September 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor