+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 324 of the Acts of 2014
On September 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 18, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On August 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2014 from 10:30 AM-11:30 AM in A-2
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor