+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 16, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4684
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 21, 2018, pending concurrence
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday April 26, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday April 12, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/13/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday March 15, 2018, pending concurrence
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
On December 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules